Global Patent Index - EP 0916456 A3

EP 0916456 A3 2002-09-25 - Electric hand tool

Title (en)

Electric hand tool

Title (de)

Elektrohandwerkzeugmaschine

Title (fr)

Outil à main électrique

Publication

EP 0916456 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99103025 A

Priority

  • DE 19547332 A
  • EP 96934436 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19547332A1] The invention relates to an electrical tool machine (10) with a housing (11) which contains a motor (16) and a drive shaft (50) with at least two bearing points and an eccentric pin (52) movable in a circle and which contains one insert tool (88, 188, 288) coupled to the eccentric pin (52), movable backwards and forwards and having a fixing end (77) held in the housing (11). A carrier (68, 69) for transmission of movement is arranged between the insert tool (88, 188, 288) and the eccentric pin (51, 52), and the carrier (68, 69) has a bore (72, 72') into which the eccentric pin (51, 52) pivotably engages. Said tool machine can be produced more simply and economically in that the drive shaft (50) bearing point facing and/or facing away from the tool is operatively connected to at least one adjustment means (56) axially displacing the drive shaft (50) in relation to the housing (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25F 5/02; B24B 23/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23Q 5/04 (2006.01); B24B 23/04 (2006.01); B25F 5/00 (2006.01); B25F 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 23/04 (2013.01); B25F 5/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19547332 A1 19970626; CN 1112982 C 20030702; CN 1205664 A 19990120; EP 0868256 A1 19981007; EP 0868256 B1 20021016; EP 0916456 A2 19990519; EP 0916456 A3 20020925; EP 0916456 B1 20050608; JP 2000501029 A 20000202; WO 9722437 A1 19970626

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051026

2006-05-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060309

2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2005-12-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2005-12-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2005-10-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051026

2005-07-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59611234 P 20050714

2005-06-08 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0868256 P

2005-06-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2005-06-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2005-06-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-06-08 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050608

2005-01-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2003-05-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030325

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990316;LT PAYMENT 19990316;LV PAYMENT 19990316;RO PAYMENT 19990316;SI PAYMENT 19990316

1999-05-19 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 868256

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT NL

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 19990316;LT PAYMENT 19990316;LV PAYMENT 19990316;RO PAYMENT 19990316;SI PAYMENT 19990316