Global Patent Index - EP 0916487 A3

EP 0916487 A3 2000-01-26 - Stretching frame

Title (en)

Stretching frame

Title (de)

Spannrahmen

Title (fr)

Cadre de mise en tension

Publication

EP 0916487 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121078 A

Priority

DE 19749449 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19749449C1] Tensioning frame (1) for metal or plastic templates. A tensioning device (4), which forms part of the frame, has gripping rods, which are inserted into perforations around the edges of the template. Pneumatically activated tensioning guides (5) of the tensioning device (4) are used with the gripping rods to control tensioning of the template. The tensioning devices (4) are tensioning tubes, which extend around the circumference of the frame. The tensioning guides (5), which are adjacent along their forward side to the tubes (4), are against rotating devices on their rear side. Rotation of the latter and their action against the tensioning guides (5) and tubes causes tensioning of the template.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 15/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/36 (2006.01); B41N 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 15/36 (2013.01); B41N 1/248 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19749449 C1 19990107; AT 214330 T 20020315; CN 1110415 C 20030604; CN 1222447 A 19990714; EP 0916487 A2 19990519; EP 0916487 A3 20000126; EP 0916487 B1 20020313; JP 2989180 B2 19991213; JP H11216839 A 19990810; US 6038969 A 20000321

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161106

2017-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161130

2017-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161106

2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-08-23 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2017-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161106

2017-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 214330 T

- Effective date: 20161106

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20161124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20151120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-09-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020925

2002-08-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2002-06-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020613

2002-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2002-03-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000405

2002-03-13 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-03-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 214330 T 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010410

2001-05-23 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: LPKF D.O.O.

2000-11-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-10-04 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 20000405

2000-05-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI