Global Patent Index - EP 0916535 B1

EP 0916535 B1 2003-06-25 - Device and method for hydraulically operating moving parts

Title (en)

Device and method for hydraulically operating moving parts

Title (de)

Anordnung und Verfahren zur hydraulischen Betätigung beweglicher Teile

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour l'actionnement hydraulique des parts mobiles

Publication

EP 0916535 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98890280 A

Priority

AT 191897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916535A2] The actuator arrangement includes devices for modulating the pressure in the working cylinders of the vehicle hood. The output signals from pressure sensors vary in accordance with the pressure modulation and are fed to a control unit, and are used for position control and/or identification of the working cylinder by the control unit. A motor vehicle hood system and a position control method are also claimed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B60J 7/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60J 7/12 (2006.01); F15B 11/028 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 15/2838 (2013.01); B60J 7/1273 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916535 A2 19990519; EP 0916535 A3 19990901; EP 0916535 B1 20030625; AT 405384 B 19990726; AT A191897 A 19981215; DE 59808802 D1 20030731; JP H11227468 A 19990824; US 6267432 B1 20010731

INPADOC legal status


2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060630

2006-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060630

2005-10-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051002

2005-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050929

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040923

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-24 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030625

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808802 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030625

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020610

2000-05-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-03-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19991217

1999-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI