Global Patent Index - EP 0916606 A3

EP 0916606 A3 2000-03-15 - Device for depositing sheets delivered by an office machine

Title (en)

Device for depositing sheets delivered by an office machine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Ablage von Blättern, die von einer Büromaschine ausgegeben werden

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour déposer des feuilles delivrées par une machine de bureau

Publication

EP 0916606 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120723 A

Priority

DE 19750592 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916606A2] Sheets (18) from a printer or copier (10) are deposited and stacked in a sheet tray (16). A magazine (22), which forms a unit with the trays (16), stores separating foils (20). The latter are laid on top of the stacks of sheets (18) in the trays (16) in order to permit separation of groups of sheets.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 33/04; B65H 29/60; B65H 39/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 29/60 (2006.01); B65H 33/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 33/04 (2013.01); B65H 29/60 (2013.01); B65H 2701/176 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 4248528 A 19810203 - SAHAY RAVI B
  • [A] US 5316279 A 19940531 - CORONA STEPHEN C [US], et al
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 264 (M - 1132) 4 July 1991 (1991-07-04)
  • [X] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 044 (M - 1547) 24 January 1994 (1994-01-24)
  • [PX] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1998, no. 08 30 June 1998 (1998-06-30)
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 012, no. 004 (M - 657) 8 January 1988 (1988-01-08)
  • [DA] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 404 (M - 1168) 15 October 1991 (1991-10-15)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1996, no. 06 28 June 1996 (1996-06-28)
  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 1997, no. 01 31 January 1997 (1997-01-31)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916606 A2 19990519; EP 0916606 A3 20000315; DE 19750592 A1 19990520; DE 19750592 C2 20000217; US 6203001 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2003-05-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020703

2000-11-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000819

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI