Global Patent Index - EP 0916610 A3

EP 0916610 A3 2000-02-02 - Winding apparatus

Title (en)

Winding apparatus

Title (de)

Aufwickelvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de bobinage

Publication

EP 0916610 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120683 A

Priority

  • DE 19750510 A
  • DE 19824593 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916610A2] The bobbin winder assembly has the yarn guide (18,21), the bobbin clamping plate (2) with the catch slit (4) and the suction unit (37) in an array so that the yarn (1) is on an angled path over the edge (6) of the clamping plate towards the bobbin sleeve (13) on the direction of clamping plate rotation. The plate edge has a yarn catch projection (5), and a cutback recess (7) of the catch slit which, with the edge of the clamping plate, form a yarn guide edge (9). The guide edge extends against the direction of rotation to an entry plane, so that the yarn is moved along the inner surface (15) of the plate into the clamping slit (14) through the clamping plate rotation. The yarn guide (18,21) moves parallel to the rotary axis of the bobbin sleeve, with the guide (18,21), sleeve clamping plate and suction unit in sequence along the line of yarn travel. The guide edge (9) has a spiral shape towards the sleeve edge (17). The clamping slit (14) is formed by a recess (12) in the centering shoulder (8) of the clamping plate and the sleeve edge. The recess has a radial angled clamping flank (16), tapering down below the sleeve edge, so that the clamping slit has an increasing width in the direction of the sleeve (13) rotation. On an axial section, the recess has a turned-in L-shape, extending over an arc of the smaller dimensions. The recess extends over the centering shoulder (8) by an angle of 60-120 degrees , so that the cutout (7) in the end edge (6) and the recess (12) in the centering shoulder overlap. The catch slit (4), at the clamping plate (2), is offset axially away from the sleeve center in front of the clamping slit, in the direction of rotation, into the entry plane. The cutter (45) is between the suction unit (37) and the sleeve clamping plate, so that the caught yarn (1) is drawn into the cutter by the catch projection (5), through the rotation of the clamping plate (2). The cutter has an entry edge with a blade at its end shortly after a step. A sensor (32) monitors the position of the catch slit (4) at the clamping plate connected to the control (27) for the movements of the yarn guide. The sensor (32) is a pulse generator, to deliver a pulse to the control on each rotation of the clamping plate. The control evaluates the number of pulses in a time unit, to calculate the sleeve rotation speed. The yarn guide is a reciprocating guide (21) at a reciprocating movement system, to move the yarn to and fro along the length of the sleeve to carry the wound yarn as a bobbin, and outside the length of the windings. The yarn guide speed is set through a variable drive, independent of the movement direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 65/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/16 (2006.01); B65H 54/06 (2006.01); B65H 54/22 (2006.01); B65H 54/34 (2006.01); B65H 54/71 (2006.01); B65H 65/00 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/34 (2013.01); B65H 54/71 (2013.01); B65H 65/00 (2013.01); B65H 67/04 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916610 A2 19990519; EP 0916610 A3 20000202; EP 0916610 B1 20030402; CN 1094460 C 20021120; CN 1217285 A 19990526; JP H11217158 A 19990810; TR 9802299 A2 19990621; TR 9802299 A3 19990621; TW 387856 B 20000421; US 6145775 A 20001114

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091105

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-10-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20081124

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071105

2008-07-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071105

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071116

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-10-17 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20061017

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2004-01-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030804

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: HERMANN KAHLHOEFER

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807719 P 20030508

2003-04-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-04-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI