Global Patent Index - EP 0916612 A3

EP 0916612 A3 2000-02-02 - Apparatus and method for guiding and cutting a continuously supplied thread

Title (en)

Apparatus and method for guiding and cutting a continuously supplied thread

Title (de)

Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Führen und Schneiden eines kontinuierlich zulaufenden Fadens

Title (fr)

Dispositif et procédé pour guider et couper un fil textile alimenté en continu

Publication

EP 0916612 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120681 A

Priority

  • DE 19750510 A
  • DE 19826536 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916612A2] The bobbin winder assembly, which is fed with a continuous yarn (1) for winding, has a yarn guide (18) which is in front of the rotating bobbin sleeve (13) in the direction of yarn travel, and the suction yarn catch unit (37) is after the sleeve. To sever the yarn, on a bobbin change, the yarn guide and suction unit are at a transfer plane. The transfer unit (42) has a grip arm (43), which moves parallel to the transfer plane, with its free end in the yarn path between the yarn guide and the full bobbin (24) detached from the friction drive roller (29). The suction unit is within the movement radius of the free end of the grip arm (43). The suction connection (39) and the cutter (38) are behind each other, on the transfer plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/04; B65H 54/71

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/16 (2006.01); B65H 54/34 (2006.01); B65H 54/40 (2006.01); B65H 54/71 (2006.01); B65H 65/00 (2006.01); B65H 67/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 54/34 (2013.01); B65H 54/71 (2013.01); B65H 65/00 (2013.01); B65H 67/04 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916612 A2 19990519; EP 0916612 A3 20000202; EP 0916612 B1 20030319; CN 1094462 C 20021120; CN 1217287 A 19990526; JP 4155642 B2 20080924; JP H11217161 A 19990810; TR 9802303 A2 19990621; TR 9802303 A3 19990621; TW 443987 B 20010701; US 6189826 B1 20010220

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-07-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101130

2011-06-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091105

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-01-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20091124

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081105

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081120

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081210

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071018

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-03-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031222

2003-12-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030724

2003-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BARMAG GMBH ENGINEERING AND MANUFACTURING

2003-04-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59807530 P 20030424

2003-03-27 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2003-03-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020411

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI