Global Patent Index - EP 0916613 A3

EP 0916613 A3 2000-09-13 - Tube supplying apparatus for Textile machine for making cross-wound bobbins

Title (en)

Tube supplying apparatus for Textile machine for making cross-wound bobbins

Title (de)

Hülsenvorlageeinrichtung für Kreuzspulen herstellende Textilmaschinen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour alimenter en tubes une machine textile pour la production de bobines à spires croisées

Publication

EP 0916613 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118041 A

Priority

DE 19750836 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916613A2] The bobbin sleeve feed system, for a bobbin winder to wind cross wound bobbins, has a conveyor (10) on a horizontal path (18) along the machine length with a control strip (19) sliding along it, with matching openings (23, 24) in each. A sleeve carrier trolley (20) travels on the path between an intermediate sleeve store and the central magazine, fitted with a sleeve grip (21) activated magnetically, and controlled by the setting of the control strip. The horizontal path and the control strip are of a ferromagnetic material. The control strip is moved by a push piston between two control positions. In the first position, the opening (24) in the strip is positioned with the opening (23) in the stationary path and, in the second position, all the openings in the stationary path are covered. The sleeve carrier trolley is moved by preferably, a toothed belt and the like, through a pinion at an electro drive. A high resolution sensor monitors the positions of each sleeve carrier trolley (20). The sleeve grip (21) has two swing grip arms (31, 32) linked by a spring steel strip (33), with a permanent magnet packet (35) fixed to it. Springs (34) hold the grip arms in the open position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 67/068 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916613 A2 19990519; EP 0916613 A3 20000913; EP 0916613 B1 20030521; DE 19750836 A1 19990520; JP H11209002 A 19990803; US 6012671 A 20000111

INPADOC legal status


2005-09-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-05-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050401

2004-09-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-09-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-05-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-05-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040224

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-10-02 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031002

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-09-25 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030925

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808429 P 20030626

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2003-05-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2002-12-11 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TUBE SUPPLYING APPARATUS FOR TEXTILE MACHINES FOR MAKING CROSS-WOUND BOBBINS

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020828

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI