Global Patent Index - EP 0916614 A3

EP 0916614 A3 2000-09-13 - Tube magazine for a textile machine producing crosswound bobbins

Title (en)

Tube magazine for a textile machine producing crosswound bobbins

Title (de)

Hülsenmagazin für eine Kreuzspulen herstellende Textilmaschine

Title (fr)

Magasin de tubes pour une machine textile pour la fabrication de bobines à spires croisées

Publication

EP 0916614 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118047 A

Priority

DE 19750859 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916614A2] The central magazine (11), for bobbin sleeves, has a sleeve transfer unit (70) with a grip carrier (16) on a vertical movement path. The carrier is fitted with at least one controlled bobbin sleeve grip (17). The central magazine has a control unit, with a programmable control system dedicated to the central magazine, and an exchangeable sleeve store (51) in a central unit (50) fitted with columns (12-15) of sleeves each with loading shafts (22). The grip carrier (16) has a number of neighboring sleeve grips with defined control, with a separate grip for each column of sleeves. The sensor is a light scanner. The central unit has an input keyboard (43). The control is connected to the sensors at the grip carrier (16) and to a reversible drive for the vertical positioning of the grip carrier. The loading shafts have side guide bars (27, 28) to guide the ends of the cylindrical or conical bobbin sleeves (8).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65H 67/06; B65H 49/38

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/38 (2006.01); B65H 67/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65H 49/38 (2013.01); B65H 67/067 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916614 A2 19990519; EP 0916614 A3 20000913; EP 0916614 B1 20030521; DE 19750859 A1 19990602; JP H11222358 A 19990817; US 6056228 A 20000502

INPADOC legal status


2006-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-11-22 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20060627

2005-10-05 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051005

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-09-21 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050921

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-05-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2004-04-14 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: RIETER INGOLSTADT SPINNEREIMASCHINENBAU AG

- Effective date: 20040220

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808430 P 20030626

2003-05-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-05-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2003-05-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030521

2002-10-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020828

2001-05-30 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR IT LI

2001-05-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010313

2000-09-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI