Global patent index - EP 0916738 A3

EP 0916738 A3 2000-02-02 - Method and apparatus for preserving thick juice

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for preserving thick juice

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Konservierung von Dicksaft

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil pour la conservation du jus dense

Publication

EP 0916738 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98890259 A

Priority

AT 195497 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916738A2] Method for improving the storage stability of thick juice (with a sugar concentration of 65-70 wt.%) in a tank comprises covering the surface of the thick juice with a 1-5 mm layer of 10-30 wt.% aqueous alkali metal hydroxide solution. Also claimed is an apparatus for carrying out the above method, comprising a tank with a lid, an inlet and outlet for thick juice, and (a) a nozzle system for spraying the alkali onto the surface of the thick juice, or (b) alkali supply devices that are located above the liquid surface in the tank and are connected to inlets around the wall of the tank, or (c) alkali supply devices that are located above the liquid surface in the tank and have outlet openings that can be directed onto a body floating on the surface of the thick juice.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C13D 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C13B 10/00 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C13B 10/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916738 A2 19990519; EP 0916738 A3 20000202; AT 406377 B 20000425; AT A195497 A 19990915

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20040401

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

2000-07-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000531

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI