Global Patent Index - EP 0916797 A3

EP 0916797 A3 2000-06-07 - Window or door

Title (en)

Window or door

Title (de)

Fenster oder Tür

Title (fr)

Fenêtre ou porte

Publication

EP 0916797 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121326 A

Priority

DE 19749776 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916797A2] A decoration trim element (75), to form the visible side of the window or door, is at the inner side of the window/door (10) to cover the pane frame (12) and the screen frame (11). It is in two parts (72,87), where one part (72) is at the pane frame (12) and the other part (87) is at the screen frame (11), gripping round them so that, when the widow or door (10) is closed there is an even visible side. The decoration element can be a solid bar of wood or plastics, or a profile of plastics or metal.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/30; E06B 3/54

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/305 (2013.01); E06B 3/301 (2013.01); E06B 3/308 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916797 A2 19990519; EP 0916797 A3 20000607

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-20 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100504

2005-07-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050610

2001-02-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001127

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI