Global patent index - EP 0916808 A3

EP 0916808 A3 2000-01-12 - Turbine

Title (en)

Turbine

Title (de)

Turbine

Title (fr)

Turbine

Publication

EP 0916808 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98308747 A

Priority

GB 9723268 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916808A2] A turbine (10) for a gas turbine engine includes an annular array of turbine aerofoil blades (12) which are mounted on a disc (19). Each of the aerofoil blades (12) is provided with a radially inner platform (21) . Each platform (21) includes a passage (37) into which leaked cooling air flows. The passages (37) are disposed in a direction having a circumferential component so that cooling air is exhausted from them in a direction that is generally opposite to that in which the disc (19) operationally rotates. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01D 5/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 5/082 (2013.01); F01D 5/085 (2013.01); F05D 2240/81 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916808 A2 19990519; EP 0916808 A3 20000112; EP 0916808 B1 20030312; DE 69812044 D1 20030417; DE 69812044 T2 20030821; GB 9723268 D0 19980107

INPADOC legal status

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071031

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071026

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050914

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-10-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080501

2008-06-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20071026

2006-09-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060925

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-14 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060914

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-09-11 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060911

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20031215

2003-08-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-04-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69812044

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-04-17

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-03-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-03-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2002-04-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020312

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2000-03-08 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R17P

- Effective date: 19991213

2000-02-09 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19991213

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI