Global Patent Index - EP 0916828 A3

EP 0916828 A3 2000-08-02 - Method and apparatus for controlling an electromagnetic load

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for controlling an electromagnetic load

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Ansteuerung eines elektromagnetischen Verbrauchers

Title (fr)

Méthode et dispositif pour commander une charge électromagnétique

Publication

EP 0916828 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98113661 A

Priority

DE 19750027 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916828A2] The method involves determining a switching point within a time window, at which the moving member in the solenoid valve reaches a certain position. The voltage applied to the solenoid valve within the time window is controlled to an adjustable set value. The set value for the voltage is preset based on a current regulator. An Independent claim is included for an apparatus for controlling a solenoid valve for fuel dispensing in an IC engine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02D 41/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 51/00 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/20 (2006.01); F02M 51/06 (2006.01); F16K 31/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/20 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2017 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2031 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2051 (2013.01); F02D 2041/2058 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916828 A2 19990519; EP 0916828 A3 20000802; EP 0916828 B1 20040526; DE 19750027 A1 19990520; JP H11241663 A 19990907; US 6097585 A 20000801

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150925

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 18

2005-05-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050301

2005-01-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20040810

2004-07-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59811458

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-07-01

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010202

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI