Global Patent Index - EP 0916837 A3

EP 0916837 A3 2000-03-08 - Exhaust gas recirculating device for a combustion engine

Title (en)

Exhaust gas recirculating device for a combustion engine

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Abgasrückführung für einen Verbrennungsmotor

Title (fr)

Dispositif de recirculation de gaz d'échappement pour un moteur à combustion

Publication

EP 0916837 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98119748 A

Priority

DE 19750588 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916837A2] The exhaust gas return device has an exhaust gas cooler (10) and a valve (11) which sets the amount of the returned exhaust gas. The valve can be adjusted by a setting element (13). The exhaust gas cooler and the valve are connected directly to each other to form one structural unit. The setting element is fitted to a component (23) which is in heat conducting contact with the exhaust gas cooler or to a component which has one or more channels for liquid coolant.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 25/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 25/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 26/12 (2016.02); F02M 26/32 (2016.02); F02M 26/53 (2016.02)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916837 A2 19990519; EP 0916837 A3 20000308; EP 0916837 B1 20020313; EP 0916837 B2 20111026; DE 19750588 A1 19990520; DE 19750588 B4 20161013; US 6213105 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161025

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161101

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161022

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-12-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PIERBURG GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; PIERBURG GMBH, 41460 NEUSS, DE

- Document: DE 59803324

2015-12-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAHLE BEHR GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNERS: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG, 70469 STUTTGART, DE; PIERBURG GMBH, 41460 NEUSS, DE

- Document: DE 59803324

2015-12-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803324

- Representative's name: GRAUEL, ANDREAS, DIPL.-PHYS. DR. RER. NAT., DE

2015-10-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-12-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59803324

- Representative's name: GRAUEL, ANDREAS, DIPL.-PHYS. DR. RER. NAT., DE

2011-12-15 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59803324

- Effective date: 20111026

2011-11-29 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2011-10-26 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20111026

2011-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2011-10-26 [REG DE R102] EPO DECISION MAINTAINING PATENT IN AMENDED FORM NOW FINAL

- Document: DE 59803324

2004-11-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO. KG

- Effective date: 20021127

2004-11-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MODINE EUROPE GMBH

- Effective date: 20021209

2004-11-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Effective date: 20021213

2004-11-03 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: COOPER-STANDARD AUTOMOTIVE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

- Effective date: 20021213

2004-10-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO. KG

- Effective date: 20021127

2004-10-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MODINE EUROPE GMBH

- Effective date: 20021209

2004-10-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Effective date: 20021213

2004-10-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: COOPER-STANDARD AUTOMOTIVE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

- Effective date: 20021213

2004-09-03 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2004-03-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

2004-03-24 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: PIERBURG GMBH

2003-02-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO. KG

- Effective date: 20021127

2003-02-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MODINE EUROPE GMBH

- Effective date: 20021209

2003-02-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Effective date: 20021213

2003-02-12 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: COOPER-STANDARD AUTOMOTIVE (DEUTSCHLAND) GMBH

- Effective date: 20021213

2003-02-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO. KG

- Effective date: 20021127

2003-02-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MODINE EUROPE GMBH

- Effective date: 20021209

2003-02-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: DAIMLERCHRYSLER AG

- Effective date: 20021213

2003-01-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: GUSTAV WAHLER GMBH U. CO. KG

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803324 20020418

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2000-12-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-11-15 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2000-07-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000520

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI