Global Patent Index - EP 0916862 A3

EP 0916862 A3 2000-07-19 - Propeller thrust bearing

Title (en)

Propeller thrust bearing

Title (de)

Propelleraxiallager

Title (fr)

Palier axial d'hélice

Publication

EP 0916862 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98850171 A

Priority

SE 9704203 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916862A2] A propeller thrust bearing assembly of the type incorporating a spherical rolling bearing (4) provided on a shaft (1) and abutting a shoulder (2), and a spherical thrust bearing (6), incorporating a shaft washer (6b) fitted on the shaft, a housing washer (6c) provided in a housing (3) surrounding the shaft and a set of rolling bodies provided between the shaft washer and the housing washer, a spacing sleeve provided between the spherical rolling bearing (4) and the spherical thrust bearing, and a lid member (9) attached to the housing (3) and adapted to urge the housing washer (6c) against the set of rolling bodies and via this against the shaft washer (6b), whereby the axial distance between the two bearings (4, 6) is such that their force lines (4a, 4b; 6a) meet in a point (7) situated on the centre axis of the shat, whereby the spherical rolling bearing (4) has a taper bore and is mounted on a withdrawal sleeve (5), and the spacing sleeve (8) has internal threads and is screwed onto the withdrawal sleeve (5), and a tubular member (12) is arranged about the shaft (1) and is adapted to keep the shaft washer (6b) pressed against the rear end of the spacing sleeve (8) facing away from the spherical rolling bearing (4), which tubular member (12) is secured in position by means of a locking nut (13) screwed onto threads of the shaft. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16C 35/073; B63H 23/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16C 35/06 (2006.01); F16C 19/34 (2006.01); F16C 19/56 (2006.01); F16C 35/073 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16C 19/545 (2013.01); F16C 19/56 (2013.01); F16C 23/086 (2013.01); F16C 35/063 (2013.01); F16C 35/073 (2013.01); F16C 2226/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916862 A2 19990519; EP 0916862 A3 20000719; EP 0916862 B1 20040630; CN 1086779 C 20020626; CN 1217437 A 19990526; DE 69824811 D1 20040805; DE 69824811 T2 20050714; JP 2954586 B2 19990927; JP H11210772 A 19990803; SE 508830 C2 19981109; SE 9704203 D0 19971113; SE 9704203 L 19981109; US 6170991 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091106

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091106

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20091106

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081128

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081223

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081117

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20081126

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-01-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69824811 P 20040805

2004-06-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-06-30 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010119

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-07-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 16C 35/073 A, 7B 63H 23/32 B

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI