Global Patent Index - EP 0916865 A3

EP 0916865 A3 2001-12-05 - Squeak preventing shim

Title (en)

Squeak preventing shim

Title (de)

Quietschverhindernde Unterlageplatte

Title (fr)

Plaque anti-grincement

Publication

EP 0916865 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309309 A

Priority

JP 32946297 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916865A2] The present invention provides a squeak preventing shim for a disk brake for an automobile. In the shim construction there are formed a plurality of grooves (11) or recesses (12) in rubber layers (2) disposed on two surfaces of a metal plate (1) in a rubber coat metal. Owing to these grooves (11) or recesses (12), the apparent transversal elastic modulus of the rubber layers (2) lowers and a squeak preventing effect due to vibration in a parallel direction to the shim can be obtained, even if no lubricant is used. Further, since the longitudinal elastic modulus varies not so much, it is possible also to prevent lowering of durability such as buckling, flow, etc. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16D 65/097

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16D 65/095 (2006.01); F16D 65/00 (2006.01); F16D 65/097 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16D 65/0006 (2013.01); F16D 65/0971 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916865 A2 19990519; EP 0916865 A3 20011205; EP 0916865 B1 20030903; DE 69817733 D1 20031009; DE 69817733 T2 20040401; JP H11148521 A 19990602; US 6213257 B1 20010410

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171012

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171108

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-10-12 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-08-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040604

2004-08-25 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-15 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2003-10-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69817733 P 20031009

2003-09-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-09-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: NICHIAS CORPORATION

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YANO, KUNIHIKO

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NIWA, TAKAHIRO

2003-08-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOSHIHARA, MASAKI

2002-08-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020628

2002-05-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020319

2001-12-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-12-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YANO, KUNIHIKO

1999-05-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: NIWA, TAKAHIRO

1999-05-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: YOHSIHARA, MASAKI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI