Global Patent Index - EP 0916880 A3

EP 0916880 A3 2000-10-04 - Equalising valve

Title (en)

Equalising valve

Title (de)

Be- und Entlüftungsventil

Title (fr)

Soupape d'équilibrage

Publication

EP 0916880 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98118242 A

Priority

DE 19746106 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19746106A1] The valve body (22) rests against a first (6) and second (15) side of a passage. The pressure difference according to the direction reinforces the sealing pressure of the valve body against the first or second passage-side. The valve body is rotationally symmetrically formed in an especially membrane like dish. The valve body is positioned between holders (8,9,17) protruding from opposite sides into a valve housing.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F16K 17/19

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16K 17/18 (2006.01); F16K 24/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16K 17/18 (2013.01); F16K 24/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19746106 A1 19990422; EP 0916880 A2 19990519; EP 0916880 A3 20001004

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-04 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020710

2002-07-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020517

2001-06-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI