Global Patent Index - EP 0916893 A3

EP 0916893 A3 2001-01-31 - Lamp with versatile fitting-out possibilities

Title (en)

Lamp with versatile fitting-out possibilities

Title (de)

Leuchte mit besonders vielseitigen Ausstattungsmöglichkeiten

Title (fr)

Lampe avec possibilités d' équipement particulièrment variables

Publication

EP 0916893 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121046 A

Priority

DE 19749766 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916893A2] The luminaire has a heat-protection wall (2) with a circuit board chamber and lamp socket. An accessory may be included such as a light controller, motion sensor, timer, alarm or infrared remote controller, radio controller, ultrasound controller, EIB bus connection, biorhythm light controller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 15/00 (2006.01); F21V 15/06 (2006.01); F21V 23/00 (2006.01); F21V 33/00 (2006.01); H01R 33/90 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21V 33/0056 (2013.01); F21V 29/15 (2013.01); H01R 33/90 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916893 A2 19990519; EP 0916893 A3 20010131; DE 19749766 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-14 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-01-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010601

2001-10-17 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-01-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-31 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOFFMEISTER LEUCHTEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-10-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HOFFMEISTER LEUCHTEN GMBH

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI