Global Patent Index - EP 0916897 A3

EP 0916897 A3 2000-10-25 - Heat shield

Title (en)

Heat shield

Title (de)

Hitzeschild

Title (fr)

Bouclier thermique

Publication

EP 0916897 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98811060 A

Priority

DE 19750517 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916897A2] The heat shield (1) consists of a felt-like material (3) made of pressed and sintered inter metallic fibers. The fibers may consist of an inter metallic phase based on iron or nickel. The felt-like material may be arranged on a substrate material (2), and have a thermally insulating layer (4) made of partially or fully stabilized zircon oxide. The heat shield can be cooled by open pores in the felt-like material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/00; F01D 25/08; F16L 59/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/00 (2006.01); F01D 25/08 (2006.01); F02C 7/00 (2006.01); F16L 59/02 (2006.01); F23R 3/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/08 (2013.01); F23R 3/007 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0466 (2013.01); F05D 2300/2118 (2013.01); F05D 2300/614 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12153 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12444 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12479 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12535 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12611 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12618 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12944 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12951 (2013.01); Y10T 428/131 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916897 A2 19990519; EP 0916897 A3 20001025; EP 0916897 B1 20030604; DE 19750517 A1 19990520; JP H11236995 A 19990831; US 6492034 B1 20021210

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59808608

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808608

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59808608

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59808608

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808608

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-08-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808

2012-07-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808608

- Representative's name: UWE ROESLER, DE

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808608 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI