Global Patent Index - EP 0916897 B1

EP 0916897 B1 2003-06-04 - Heat shield

Title (en)

Heat shield

Title (de)

Hitzeschild

Title (fr)

Bouclier thermique

Publication

EP 0916897 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98811060 A

Priority

DE 19750517 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0916897A2] The heat shield (1) consists of a felt-like material (3) made of pressed and sintered inter metallic fibers. The fibers may consist of an inter metallic phase based on iron or nickel. The felt-like material may be arranged on a substrate material (2), and have a thermally insulating layer (4) made of partially or fully stabilized zircon oxide. The heat shield can be cooled by open pores in the felt-like material.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23R 3/00; F01D 25/08; F16L 59/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/00 (2006.01); F01D 25/08 (2006.01); F02C 7/00 (2006.01); F16L 59/02 (2006.01); F23R 3/00 (2006.01); F23R 3/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01D 25/08 (2013.01); F23R 3/007 (2013.01); F05C 2201/0466 (2013.01); F05D 2300/2118 (2013.01); F05D 2300/614 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12153 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12444 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12479 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12535 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12611 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12618 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12944 (2013.01); Y10T 428/12951 (2013.01); Y10T 428/131 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0916897 A2 19990519; EP 0916897 A3 20001025; EP 0916897 B1 20030604; DE 19750517 A1 19990520; JP H11236995 A 19990831; US 6492034 B1 20021210

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20171022

2018-05-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59808608

2017-10-23 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59808608

2017-10-23 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808608

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2017-09-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170824 AND 20170830

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161020

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59808608

2016-08-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59808608

2016-08-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808608

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59808608

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: GENERAL ELECTRIC TECHNOLOGY GMBH, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59808608

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: ANSALDO ENERGIA SWITZERLAND AG, CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD., BADEN, CH

- Document: DE 59808608

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-09-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808608

- Representative's name: ROESLER, UWE, DIPL.-PHYS.UNIV., DE

- Effective date: 20120713

2012-08-29 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120802 AND 20120808

2012-07-13 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59808608

- Representative's name: UWE ROESLER, DE

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2003-10-22 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808608 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE GB

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM (SWITZERLAND) LTD

2002-09-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020719

2002-01-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALSTOM

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE GB

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI