Global Patent Index - EP 0916899 B1

EP 0916899 B1 2003-06-04 - Ceramic heating element as a cooking plate in a recess of a plane surface

Title (en)

Ceramic heating element as a cooking plate in a recess of a plane surface

Title (de)

Keramisches Heizelement als Kochzone in einer Aussparung einer Fläche

Title (fr)

Elément céramique de chauffage en tant que zone de cuisson dans un évidement de surface

Publication

EP 0916899 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98119600 A

Priority

DE 19746845 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19746845C1] The heating element has a ceramics carrier (3) with good heat conduction characteristics fitted into an opening in a cooking hob surface (2) made of ceramics glass, glass, ceramics, metal or plastics, with the surface of the hob having a truncated conical raised edge (2b) around the outside of the opening, on which the peripheral edge of the ceramics carrier is supported. The hob surface is contacted on the underside by a plate attached to the underside of the heating element, or has an integral dished region at the rear of the heating element inserted in the hob opening.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/10; H05B 3/68; H05B 3/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/14 (2006.01); F24C 7/04 (2006.01); F24C 15/10 (2006.01); H05B 3/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 3/74 (2013.01); F24C 15/102 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19746845 C1 19981203; BR 9804042 A 19991214; CA 2251242 A1 19990423; EP 0916899 A2 19990519; EP 0916899 A3 19990721; EP 0916899 B1 20030604; JP H11218333 A 19990810; PL 329306 A1 19990426; US 6050176 A 20000418

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061016

2007-07-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070629

2007-06-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061016

2007-06-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-05-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070501

2006-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-05-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-10-14 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-14 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051014

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-10-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051003

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-09-30 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: SCHOTT AG

- Free text: SCHOTT GLAS#HATTENBERGSTRASSE 10#55122 MAINZ (DE) -TRANSFER TO- SCHOTT AG#HATTENBERGSTRASSE 10#55122 MAINZ (DE)

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SCHOTT GLAS

- Effective date: 20031031

2004-04-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *CARL ZEISS STIFTUNG TRADING AS SCHOTT GLASWERKE

- Effective date: 20031031

2004-04-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-10-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031031

2003-10-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031007

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59808609 P 20030710

2003-06-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-01-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: CERAMIC HEATING ELEMENT AS A COOKING PLATE IN A RECESS OF A PLANE SURFACE

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020220

2000-03-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-07-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-07-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981016

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI