Global Patent Index - EP 0917082 A3

EP 0917082 A3 2000-05-03 - Card reader

Title (en)

Card reader

Title (de)

Kartenleser

Title (fr)

Lecteur de cartes

Publication

EP 0917082 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98118698 A

Priority

JP 31234097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917082A2] A card reader for reading the data recorded in an IC card comprises a front case (12a) having a substrate and an inner panel (18) mounted thereto, and a rear case (12b) detachably mounted to the front case (12a). A plurality of claws (21a to 21e and 22a to 22e), which can be engaged with each other, are formed at the peripheral portions of the front case (12a) and the rear case (12b) so as to permit the rear case (12b) to be detachable from the front case (12a). The particular construction makes it possible to renew batteries (V1, V2) and to wash contact pins (16a, 16b) forming contact points with the IC card. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06K 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 17/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/00 (2006.01); H01M 2/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/0013 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0917082 A2 19990519; EP 0917082 A3 20000503; EP 0917082 B1 20060809; CN 1139892 C 20040225; CN 1217511 A 19990526; DE 69835490 D1 20060921; DE 69835490 T2 20070719; DE 69835490 T8 20071018; JP 3923624 B2 20070606; JP H11144009 A 19990528; TW M247953 U 20041021; US 6170753 B1 20010109

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091002

2010-07-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100501

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091102

2010-07-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100630

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20081001

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20081014

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070510

2007-03-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2006-09-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69835490 P 20060921

2006-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-08-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050310

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981008

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI