Global Patent Index - EP 0917123 A3

EP 0917123 A3 2000-04-19 - Laminatable label and method for its production

Title (en)

Laminatable label and method for its production

Title (de)

Laminierbarer Markierer und Verfahren zu seiner Herstellung

Title (fr)

Etiquette laminable et méthode de sa fabrication

Publication

EP 0917123 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98101513 A

Priority

DE 19750203 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917123A2] The marker has a base film (5) with a leading side (5a) which can take writing, with an adhesive bond at the trailing side (5b) with the protective film (9) through a carrier film (7). The protective film (9) extends over the edge (10) of the base film (5) to give a protective film section (9a). The extended carrier film (7) has a weakened line (11) at the edge (10) of the base film as a pull-off section (7a) over the protective film section (9a).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/02; G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2013.01); G09F 3/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0917123 A2 19990519; EP 0917123 A3 20000419; DE 19750203 A1 19990520

INPADOC legal status


2001-08-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-07-04 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001020

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI