Global Patent Index - EP 0917124 B1

EP 0917124 B1 2004-12-29 - Laminate protected label

Title (en)

Laminate protected label

Title (de)

Laminat-geschütztes Etikett

Title (fr)

Etiquette protégée par un stratifié

Publication

EP 0917124 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98121307 A

Priority

DE 19749632 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19749632C1] A laminate protected, self adhesive label on a carrier material, comprises a writing area and a transparent protective laminate for covering it. The label (1) has two sections (2, 3) which are adjacent to each other in a single plane. One of the sections (3) is transparent and has an adhesive layer (10) which is exposed after removing a protective cover (11). Preferably the non-transparent film used for the writing is metallised polyester.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/02; G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19749632 C1 19990325; AT 286292 T 20050115; EP 0917124 A2 19990519; EP 0917124 A3 20000126; EP 0917124 B1 20041229

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20171124

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20171123

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-02-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20171024

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20171120

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171121

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-11-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-06-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812447

- Representative's name: KIERDORF RITSCHEL PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2014-06-22 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812447

- Representative's name: KIERDORF RITSCHEL RICHLY PATENTANWAELTE PARTG , DE

2012-07-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812447

- Representative's name: FLEISCHER, GODEMEYER, KIERDORF & PARTNER, PATE, DE

2012-07-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812447

- Representative's name: KIERDORF RITSCHEL PATENTANWAELTE PARTG MBB, DE

2012-07-04 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59812447

- Representative's name: KIERDORF RITSCHEL RICHLY PATENTANWAELTE PARTG , DE

2011-03-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: CCL DESIGN GMBH

- Free text: CCL DESIGN GMBH#LINDGESFELD 26#42653 SOLINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CCL DESIGN GMBH#LINDGESFELD 26#42653 SOLINGEN (DE)

2010-02-26 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2010-02-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: CCL DESIGN GMBH

- Effective date: 20091118

2009-12-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20091126 AND 20091202

2009-11-13 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: CCL DESIGN GMBH

- Free text: ELTEX INDUSTRIEKENNZEICHNUNG GMBH#SCHABERGER STRASSE 59#42659 SOLINGEN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- CCL DESIGN GMBH#LINDGESFELD 26#42653 SOLINGEN (DE)

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050930

2005-05-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20050407

2005-04-29 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2005-04-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-02-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59812447 P 20050203

2004-12-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-12-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2004-12-29 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-07-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030526

2001-05-16 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT

- Owner name: ELTEX INDUSTRIEKENNZEICHNUNG GMBH

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI