Global patent index - EP 0917343 A3

EP 0917343 A3 2000-11-15 - Correcting image errors in a shuttle scanner

Title (en)

Correcting image errors in a shuttle scanner

Title (de)

Bildfehlerkorrektur in Pendelabtaster

Title (fr)

Correction d'erreurs d'image dans un balayeur va et vient

Publication

EP 0917343 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309290 A

Priority

KR 19970059620 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917343A2] A method of correcting image errors in the output from a shuttle scanner is described. A predetermined pattern that comprises a plurality of lines is printed on a record sheet by a print head that remains stationary whilst the record paper is moved in a direction perpendicular to the scanning direction. The record sheet is scanned and the scanned data stored then compared with pre-set reference data to determine any image errors. A document is scanned and the scanned document data is corrected by an amount derived from a table of corrections in accordance with the said image error. For each line of scanned document data in the direction perpendicular to the scanning direction, the number of errors is determined and the data is corrected by offsetting the pixels of scanned data in that direction. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 1/047

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/32 (2006.01); G06K 5/00 (2006.01); G06K 7/10 (2006.01); H04N 1/024 (2006.01); H04N 1/047 (2006.01); H04N 1/387 (2006.01); H04N 1/12 (2006.01); H04N 1/191 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 1/128 (2013.01); H04N 1/0473 (2013.01); H04N 1/12 (2013.01); H04N 1/1911 (2013.01); H04N 2201/04703 (2013.01); H04N 2201/04787 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. H04N 2201/04703 + H04N 2201/04717 + H04N 2201/04734
  2. H04N 2201/04787 + H04N 2201/04793 + H04N 2201/02439 + H04N 2201/04794

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0917343 A2 19990519; EP 0917343 A3 20001115; EP 0917343 B1 20030820; DE 69817300 D1 20030925; DE 69817300 T2 20040609; JP 3031618 B2 20000410; JP H11225268 A 19990817; KR 100260931 B1 20000701; US 6295386 B1 20010925

INPADOC legal status

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091113

2010-12-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091113

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100601

2010-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091130

2010-08-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100730

2010-07-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20091113

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081112

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081127

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-01-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20081107

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-08-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040524

2004-06-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-09-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69817300

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-09-25

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2003-08-20 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-08-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO. LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-01-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011121

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19981202

1999-05-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-05-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI