Global Patent Index - EP 0917431 B1

EP 0917431 B1 2002-09-18 - DEHYDRATED POTATO FLAKES

Title (en)

DEHYDRATED POTATO FLAKES

Title (de)

DEHYDRATISIERTE KARTOFFELFLOCKEN

Title (fr)

FLOCONS DE POMME DE TERRE DESHYDRATES

Publication

EP 0917431 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97931556 A

Priority

  • US 9711653 W
  • US 2093696 P
  • US 2252196 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9800036A1] Dehydrated potato flakes prepared from potato slices, slivers and/or nubbins suitable for use in dough compositions used to make fabricated products. The dehydrated flakes are prepared such that the physical properties in the flake are controlled during processing. The resulting flakes can be used to prepare a more cohesive, non-adhesive, machineable dough.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A23L 1/2165; A23L 1/0522

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A21D 10/00 (2006.01); A23L 1/0522 (2006.01); A23L 1/064 (2006.01); A23L 1/164 (2006.01); A23L 1/216 (2006.01); A23L 1/2165 (2006.01); A23L 1/217 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A23L 19/19 (2016.08); A23L 19/15 (2016.08); Y10S 426/808 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

WO 9601572 A1 19960125 - PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9800036 A1 19980108; AT 224147 T 20021015; AT 306199 T 20051015; AT 375093 T 20071015; AT 395837 T 20080615; AU 3515397 A 19980121; BR 9710138 A 19990810; BR 9710138 B1 20111101; CA 2261193 A1 19980108; CA 2261193 C 20050111; CA 2402542 A1 19980108; CA 2402542 C 20070403; CA 2484273 A1 19980108; CA 2484273 C 20070918; CN 1110262 C 20030604; CN 1227470 A 19990901; DE 69715634 D1 20021024; DE 69715634 T2 20030522; DE 69734366 D1 20060223; DE 69734366 T2 20060713; DE 69738208 D1 20071122; DE 69738208 T2 20080710; DE 69738725 D1 20080703; EP 0917431 A1 19990526; EP 0917431 B1 20020918; EP 1219181 A1 20020703; EP 1219181 B1 20051012; EP 1570750 A1 20050907; EP 1570750 B1 20071010; EP 1588628 A1 20051026; EP 1588628 B1 20080521; ES 2179354 T3 20030116; ES 2250578 T3 20060416; ES 2308336 T3 20081201; JP 3214861 B2 20011002; JP H11513894 A 19991130; US 2003096052 A1 20030522; US 2003096053 A1 20030522; US 2003104114 A1 20030605; US 2003104115 A1 20030605; US 2003104116 A1 20030605; US 2003104117 A1 20030605; US 2006216398 A1 20060928; US 2009098260 A1 20090416; US 6066353 A 20000523; US 6177116 B1 20010123; US 6235333 B1 20010522; US 6312747 B1 20011106; US 6461663 B1 20021008; US 6544580 B1 20030408; US 6994880 B2 20060207; US 7060317 B2 20060613; US 7060318 B2 20060613; US 7081266 B2 20060725; US 7482033 B2 20090127; US 7998522 B2 20110816

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-08 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20180508

2018-04-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: KELLOGG EUROPE TRADING LIMITED, IE

- Document: AT 224147 T

- Effective date: 20180306

2017-08-15 [REG AT MK07] EXPIRY

- Document: AT 224147 T

- Effective date: 20170701

2017-07-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-07-26 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20170630

2017-07-05 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20170630

2017-07-01 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 69715634

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160630

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160628

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160711

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20160524

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160629

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160613

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-06-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2013-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: PRINGLES S.A.R.L., LU

- Document: AT 224147 T

- Effective date: 20131008

2013-04-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130321 AND 20130327

2013-01-23 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: PRINGLES S.A.R.L.

- Effective date: 20130111

2012-11-23 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: PRINGLES S.A.R.L., LU

- Effective date: 20121023

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PRINGLES S.A.R.L., LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, CINCINNATI, US

- Document: DE 69715634

- Effective date: 20120921

2012-11-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PRINGLES S.A.R.L., LU

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY, CINCINNATI, OHIO, US

- Document: DE 69715634

- Effective date: 20120921

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715634

- Representative's name: TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GBR PATENTANWA, DE

- Effective date: 20120921

2012-11-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715634

- Representative's name: TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

- Effective date: 20120921

2012-11-14 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20121107

2012-09-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69715634

- Representative's name: TER MEER STEINMEISTER & PARTNER GBR PATENTANWA, DE

2004-05-05 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-07-01 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-07-01 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2179354 T3

2002-12-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021219

2002-12-18 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-12-18 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021218

2002-11-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69715634 20021024

2002-10-16 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-09-18 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020918

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224147 T 20021015

2000-03-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000210

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990125

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE