Global Patent Index - EP 0917436 B1

EP 0917436 B1 2000-05-10 - BATHTUB

Title (en)

BATHTUB

Title (de)

BADEWANNE

Title (fr)

BAIGNOIRE

Publication

EP 0917436 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97938834 A

Priority

  • AT 144296 A
  • AT 172996 A
  • EP 9703887 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806313A1] This invention concerns a bathtub with a bottom surface (2) which is longer than in standard tubs. This effect is achieved with a tub which is bounded by a bottom surface (2) containing a drain (1), two side surfaces (3), a head-end surface (4) which slopes toward the bottom surface (2), and a foot-end surface (5) which slopes toward the bottom surface (2) in the same sense as the head-end surface (4).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47K 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 3/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806313 A1 19980219; AT 192635 T 20000515; AU 4114797 A 19980306; DE 59701660 D1 20000615; EP 0917436 A1 19990526; EP 0917436 B1 20000510

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-19 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701660

2016-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20160705

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-11-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IDEAL STANDARD INTERNATIONAL NV, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: IDEAL STANDARD INTERNATIONAL BVBA, BRUESSEL, BE

- Document: DE 59701660

2016-11-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701660

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BECKER & MUELLER, DE

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160726

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-07-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2012-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IDEAL STANDARD INTERNATIONAL BVBA, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: IDEAL-STANDARD GMBH & CO. OHG, 53121 BONN, DE

- Document: DE 59701660

- Effective date: 20120119

2012-03-15 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: IDEAL STANDARD INTERNATIONAL NV, BE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: IDEAL-STANDARD GMBH & CO. OHG, 53121 BONN, DE

- Document: DE 59701660

- Effective date: 20120119

2012-03-15 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701660

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE BECKER & MUELLER, DE

- Effective date: 20120119

2012-01-19 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701660

- Representative's name: BECKER UND KOLLEGEN, DE

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-18 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701660 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192635 T 20000515

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IDEAL-STANDARD GMBH & CO. OHG

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990609

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990104

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR