Global Patent Index - EP 0917499 B1

EP 0917499 B1 2000-11-22 - METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CORE PREFORMS AND RECYCLING CORE SAND FOR FOUNDRY

Title (en)

METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION OF CORE PREFORMS AND RECYCLING CORE SAND FOR FOUNDRY

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KERNFORMLINGEN UND UMLAUFKERNSAND FÜR GIESSEREIZWECKE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'EBAUCHES DE NOYAUX ET DE SABLE A NOYAUX DE RECYCLAGE POUR LA FONDERIE

Publication

EP 0917499 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97934549 A

Priority

  • DE 19632293 A
  • EP 9704072 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19632293A1] The invention relates to a method for the production of core preforms for foundry in which a) a mixture of inorganic, refractory foundry sand and a water glass-based inorganic binder is produced, b) the mixture is poured into a tempered core box c) the water contained in the mixture is withdrawn by a physical method and d) the core preform is taken out of the core box. The process is characterized by the fact that e) the tempered core box is subjected to a depression during filling f) the temperature/dwell time is adjusted after the closing of the core box so that a dimensionally stable and good bearing shell is formed on the edge of the preform g) the preform is immediately removed after opening of the core box and, under the effect of microwaves, is subjected to a complete drying.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22C 9/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22C 1/18 (2006.01); B22C 9/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22C 1/188 (2013.01); B22C 9/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19632293 A1 19980219; DE 19632293 C2 19990610; AT 197683 T 20001215; DK 0917499 T3 20010212; EP 0917499 A2 19990526; EP 0917499 B1 20001122; ES 2153677 T3 20010301; HU 0001766 A2 20000928; HU 0001766 A3 20001128; HU 222658 B1 20030929; WO 9806522 A2 19980219; WO 9806522 A3 19980604

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160726

2017-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160726

2017-04-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160727

2017-04-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170201

2017-04-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160726

2017-03-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 197683 T

- Effective date: 20160726

2017-03-07 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2017-03-01 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-02-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20170131

2017-02-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59702665

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150728

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20150703

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150703

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150521

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20150727

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150703

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-03 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-11-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: MINELCO GMBH, DE

- Document: AT 197683 T

- Effective date: 20120917

2011-04-27 [REG NL SD] ASSIGNMENTS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110330

2011-04-27 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Effective date: 20110330

2010-12-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20101118 AND 20101124

2010-09-15 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

2010-09-10 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

2010-09-10 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-05-28 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2002-09-10 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020910

- Year of fee payment: 6

2002-07-26 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020726

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-07-27 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20010727

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2153677 T3

2001-02-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-02-12 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-02-07 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010111

2001-01-10 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-12-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702665 20001228

2000-12-14 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-11-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: URS WEGMANN DIPL.-ING. ETH

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE

2000-11-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197683 T 20001215

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAW ALUMINIUM AG

2000-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VAW ALUMINIUM AG

2000-01-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991119

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990121

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IE IT LI NL SE