Global Patent Index - EP 0917500 B1

EP 0917500 B1 2000-05-10 - METHOD OF PRODUCING CASTINGS

Title (en)

METHOD OF PRODUCING CASTINGS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON GUSSSTÜCKEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE PIECES MOULEES EN FONTE

Publication

EP 0917500 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97918966 A

Priority

  • DE 19632195 A
  • EP 9704296 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19632195C1] In order to produce castings from cast iron with foliated graphite, the carbon content of the cast iron can be set at between approximately 3 and 4 % by controlling the melting process by means of the type and/or operation of the melting furnace. The molten mass is then cast in a sand-casting or lost-form method. During conventional cooling, the known mechanical properties of the cooled cast are set. According to the invention, in order to improve these mechanical properties in terms of hardness and strength, the casting is released from its mould at a temperature ranging from 1100 DEG C to 800 DEG C and is immediately subjected to a cooling treatment by being blasted with an air flow in order to cool it to below 723 DEG C in a given amount of time. The casting, in selected regions, is cooled to below 723 DEG C by specific intermittent bursts of air in a relatively short amount of time in order to produce a harder structure. The cooling treatment is stopped when the temperature at the eutectoid line of the iron-carbon diagram is reached.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B22D 30/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 1/613 (2006.01); C21D 5/00 (2006.01); C21D 1/667 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 5/00 (2013.01); C21D 1/613 (2013.01); C21D 1/667 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19632195 C1 19980305; AT 192680 T 20000515; EP 0917500 A1 19990526; EP 0917500 B1 20000510; ES 2145595 T3 20000701; US 6199618 B1 20010313; WO 9806524 A1 19980219

INPADOC legal status


2010-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080807

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-10-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080807

2009-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080901

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-06-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090430

2009-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080806

2009-04-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080806

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20070821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070823

- Year of fee payment: 11

2008-01-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070824

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-11-24 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20070823

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-08-23 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070823

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145595 T3

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192680 T 20000515

2000-04-17 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: CALVANI SALVI E VERONELLI S.R.L.

1999-09-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990722

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990210

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT ES FR GB IT