Global Patent Index - EP 0917504 B1

EP 0917504 B1 2000-04-19 - DRY RAZOR

Title (en)

DRY RAZOR

Title (de)

TROCKENRASIERAPPARAT

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE RASAGE A SEC

Publication

EP 0917504 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97928274 A

Priority

  • DE 19632333 A
  • EP 9703365 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19632333C1] This invention concerns a dry razor with a housing (1) and a housing element (21) in which at least one interchangeable frame (20) with at least one blade element (18) is held by at least one snap-in system (28, 29). Stop elements (40, 50, 60, 70) are provided which work together at the interchangeable frame (20) and the housing element (21). These stop elements (40, 50, 60, 70) are held in contact by at least one pressure element (30, 31) which is supported on one wall (39) and is actuated by a spring element (32, 33) and a sloping wall surface (34, 35, 36, 37) acted upon by the pressure element (30, 31); the pressure element (30, 31) and the sloping wall surface (34, 35, 36, 37) only come into play on one side of the stop elements (40, 50, 60, 70) which work together.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 19/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/04 (2006.01); B26B 19/06 (2006.01); B26B 19/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 19/048 (2013.01); B26B 19/102 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19632333 C1 19970605; AT 191873 T 20000515; CN 1071624 C 20010926; CN 1225061 A 19990804; EP 0917504 A1 19990526; EP 0917504 B1 20000419; JP 2000516116 A 20001205; US 6205666 B1 20010327; WO 9806546 A1 19980219

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120103

2012-04-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701480

- Effective date: 20120103

2011-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100626

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100630

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090626

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090630

2010-03-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20100226

2010-03-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100101

2010-02-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090626

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090616

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080626

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20080630

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-06-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050626

2005-02-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *BRAUN G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2004-06-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040630

2003-07-01 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20030701

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-23 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030623

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701480 20000525

2000-05-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000419

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: LUCHS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL

2000-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 191873 T 20000515

2000-03-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DE DOMINICIS & MAYER S.R.L.

1999-12-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRAUN GMBH

1999-08-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990617

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981219

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL