Global Patent Index - EP 0917559 A4

EP 0917559 A4 2001-02-07 - WATERBORNE LUBRICANT FOR THE COLD PLASTIC WORKING OF METALS

Title (en)

WATERBORNE LUBRICANT FOR THE COLD PLASTIC WORKING OF METALS

Title (de)

SCHMIERMITTEL AUF WASSERBASIS FÜR DIE PLASTISCHE VERARBEITUNG VON METALLEN

Title (fr)

LUBRIFIANT AQUEUX POUR LE FA ONNAGE PLASTIQUE A FROID DES METAUX

Publication

EP 0917559 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97931112 A

Priority

  • JP 18139696 A
  • US 9710108 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9748783A1] Waterborne lubricants comprising: (A) water-soluble inorganic salt; (B) homogeneously dispersed solid lubricant; (C) at least one homogeneously emulsified substance selected from mineral oils, animal and plant oils and fats, and synthetic oils; (D) surfactant; and (E) water, in which the weight ratio (B)/(A) is from 0.05:1 to 2:1 and the weight ratio {C/(A + B)} is from 0.05:1 to 1:1, provide a one-step, highly lubricating waterborne lubricant for use in the cold plastic working of metals. This waterborne lubricant can replace the conversion coating treatment (phosphate, oxalate, etc.) + reactive soap treatment combined lubrication system now in general use and is free of the environmental issues associated with the combined lubrication system, provides for facile coating removal, and is not subject to the decline in seizure resistance caused by nonuniform add-on when large numbers of workpieces are treated together by immersion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C10M 173/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21C 9/00 (2006.01); C10M 173/00 (2006.01); C10M 173/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/02 (2006.01); C10N 10/04 (2006.01); C10N 30/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 40/24 (2006.01); C10N 50/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C10M 173/00 (2013.01); C10M 2201/00 (2013.01); C10M 2201/02 (2013.01); C10M 2201/041 (2013.01); C10M 2201/042 (2013.01); C10M 2201/05 (2013.01); C10M 2201/061 (2013.01); C10M 2201/062 (2013.01); C10M 2201/063 (2013.01); C10M 2201/065 (2013.01); C10M 2201/066 (2013.01); C10M 2201/08 (2013.01); C10M 2201/081 (2013.01); C10M 2201/082 (2013.01); C10M 2201/084 (2013.01); C10M 2201/087 (2013.01); C10M 2201/10 (2013.01); C10M 2201/102 (2013.01); C10M 2201/105 (2013.01); C10M 2201/16 (2013.01); C10M 2201/18 (2013.01); C10M 2203/10 (2013.01); C10M 2203/102 (2013.01); C10M 2203/104 (2013.01); C10M 2203/106 (2013.01); C10M 2203/108 (2013.01); C10M 2205/022 (2013.01); C10M 2205/14 (2013.01); C10M 2207/125 (2013.01); C10M 2207/126 (2013.01); C10M 2207/129 (2013.01); C10M 2207/281 (2013.01); C10M 2207/282 (2013.01); C10M 2207/283 (2013.01); C10M 2207/286 (2013.01); C10M 2207/40 (2013.01); C10M 2207/402 (2013.01); C10M 2207/404 (2013.01); C10M 2209/104 (2013.01); C10M 2209/108 (2013.01); C10M 2211/06 (2013.01); C10M 2213/02 (2013.01); C10M 2213/062 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2217/044 (2013.01); C10M 2217/045 (2013.01); C10M 2219/042 (2013.01); C10M 2219/044 (2013.01); C10M 2223/04 (2013.01); C10M 2223/042 (2013.01); C10M 2223/043 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2229/041 (2013.01); C10M 2229/042 (2013.01); C10N 2210/00 (2013.01); C10N 2210/01 (2013.01); C10N 2210/02 (2013.01); C10N 2210/03 (2013.01); C10N 2210/04 (2013.01); C10N 2240/402 (2013.01); C10N 2240/403 (2013.01); C10N 2240/404 (2013.01); C10N 2240/405 (2013.01); C10N 2240/406 (2013.01); C10N 2240/407 (2013.01); C10N 2240/408 (2013.01); C10N 2240/409 (2013.01); C10N 2250/02 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 173/00 + C10M 125/22 + C10M 125/26 + C10M 125/26 + C10M 129/40 + C10M 129/74 + C10M 145/36 + C10M 147/02 + C10M 159/04 + C10M 159/08
  2. C10M 2201/087 + C10M 2201/087
  3. C10M 2201/10 + C10M 2201/10
  4. C10M 2201/102 + C10M 2201/102
  5. C10M 2201/105 + C10M 2201/105

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9748783 A1 19971224; CA 2258638 A1 19971224; CA 2258638 C 20050830; CN 1061367 C 20010131; CN 1171434 A 19980128; EP 0917559 A1 19990526; EP 0917559 A4 20010207; EP 0917559 B1 20130109; JP 3517522 B2 20040412; JP H108085 A 19980113; KR 100434573 B1 20040716; TW 367362 B 19990821

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130701

2014-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130623

2014-03-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20140228

2014-03-27 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69740543

- Effective date: 20140101

2014-02-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130623

2014-02-06 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 69740543

- Effective date: 20131010

2013-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130109

2013-12-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20131010

2013-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130109

2013-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130109

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130420

2013-07-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130109

2013-06-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 592789 T

- Effective date: 20130109

2013-03-07 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 69740543

- Effective date: 20130307

2013-01-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 592789 T

- Effective date: 20130115

2013-01-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2013-01-09 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2008-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL AG & CO. KGAA

2007-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL KOMMANDITGESELLSCHAFT AUF AKTIEN

2004-10-06 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HENKEL CORPORATION

2003-08-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030708

2001-02-07 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20001228

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2001-01-31 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 10M 173/00 A, 7C 10M 173/00 J, 7C 10M 125:22 J, 7C 10M 125:26 J, 7C 10M 125:26 J, 7C 10M 129:40 J, 7C 10M 129:74 J, 7C 10M 145:36 J, 7C 10M 147:02 J, 7C 10M 159:04 J, 7C 10M 159:08 J, 7C 10N 40:24 Z

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990111

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT SE