Global Patent Index - EP 0917594 B1

EP 0917594 B1 2000-11-29 - STEEL, METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE, ITS USE AND PRODUCT MADE FROM STEEL

Title (en)

STEEL, METHOD FOR ITS MANUFACTURE, ITS USE AND PRODUCT MADE FROM STEEL

Title (de)

STAHL, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN, VERWENDUNG UND GEGENSTAND, AUS DIESEN STAHL HERGESTELLT

Title (fr)

ACIER, PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE CET ACIER, UTILISATION DE CET ACIER ET PRODUITS FAITS DE CET ACIER

Publication

EP 0917594 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97941934 A

Priority

  • EP 9704407 W
  • NL 1003762 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9806881A1] Steel in the form of sheet or strip having the above chemical composition, balance Fe and inevitable impurities, wherein 0.4</=B/N</=1.2.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/06; C22C 38/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/02 (2006.01); C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C22C 38/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9806881 A1 19980219; AT 197820 T 20001215; AU 4379797 A 19980306; AU 712399 B2 19991104; CN 1077145 C 20020102; CN 1230231 A 19990929; DE 69703623 D1 20010104; DE 69703623 T2 20010510; DK 0917594 T3 20010326; EP 0917594 A1 19990526; EP 0917594 B1 20001129; ES 2152702 T3 20010201; GR 3035459 T3 20010531; KR 100493780 B1 20050608; KR 20000029850 A 20000525; NL 1003762 C2 19980304; PT 917594 E 20010531; ZA 9707108 B 19980303

INPADOC legal status


2008-06-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20080328

2007-02-28 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20070119

2007-01-31 [27W] PATENT REVOKED

- Effective date: 20061010

2007-01-31 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20061010

2006-09-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: USINOR

- Effective date: 20010827

2006-09-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THYSSENKRUPP STEEL AG

- Effective date: 20010828

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-07 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060807

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-03 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060803

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-01 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060801

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-20 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060720

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-18 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060718

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060714

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-13 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060713

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060712

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060710

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-05 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060705

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-12 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20050712

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2003-06-04 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: USINOR

- Effective date: 20010827

2003-06-04 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

- Effective date: 20010828

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: USINOR

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-11-07 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: THYSSEN KRUPP STAHL AG

- Effective date: 20010828

2001-10-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: USINOR

- Effective date: 20010827

2001-05-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010223

2001-03-26 [REG DK T3] EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152702 T3

2001-01-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2001-01-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-01-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69703623 20010104

2000-11-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU PT

2000-11-29 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990308;SI PAYMENT 19990308

2000-11-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 197820 T 20001215

2000-09-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: CORUS STAAL BV

2000-06-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000512

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990308

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LU PT

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: RO PAYMENT 19990308;SI PAYMENT 19990308