Global Patent Index - EP 0917612 B1

EP 0917612 B1 2000-04-05 - MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR LOCK OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR LOCK OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

KRAFTFAHRZEUG-TÜRSCHLOSS OD. DGL.

Title (fr)

SERRURE DE PORTIERE DE VEHICULE OU SIMILAIRE

Publication

EP 0917612 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97929116 A

Priority

  • DE 9701260 W
  • DE 19631869 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19631869A1] A motor vehicle door lock or the like has a housing (1) which contains a pawl (2) for a latch (3), and a force transmission chain (7) which extends from an outer handle of the door and preferably also from an inner handle of the door to the pawl (2) for actuating the pawl (2), triggering the latch (3) and opening the vehicle door. A controller (11) arranged in the housing (1) or optionally in its own housing has the settings "locked", "unlocked", and optionally "anti-theft" and "child-proof locked". The setting "locked" opens the force transmission chain (7) to the door outer handle and closes it to the door inner handle, the setting "unlocked" closes the force transmission chain (7) to the outer and inner door handles, the setting "anti-theft" opens the force transmission chain (7) to the outer and inner door handles and the setting "child-proof locked" closes the force transmission chain (7) to the outer door handle but opens it to the inner door handle. The controller (11) has a control disk (12). This motor vehicle door lock is considerably simplified, as far as the controller is concerned, in that the control disk (12) has several control cams (13, 14, 15, 16) distributed around its circumference for the various settings, and in that the force transmission chain (7) has a control section (17). In each position of the control disk (12), a control cam (13; 14; 15; 16) interacts with the force transmission chain (7) in the control section and triggers the corresponding function.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 47/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60R 25/00 (2006.01); E05B 77/26 (2014.01); E05B 77/28 (2014.01); E05B 81/06 (2014.01); E05B 81/14 (2014.01); E05B 81/16 (2014.01); E05B 81/42 (2014.01); E05B 81/82 (2014.01); E05B 81/90 (2014.01); E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 77/12 (2014.01); E05B 85/24 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/06 (2013.01); E05B 77/26 (2013.01); E05B 77/28 (2013.01); E05B 81/14 (2013.01); E05B 81/16 (2013.01); E05B 81/42 (2013.01); E05B 81/82 (2013.01); E05B 81/90 (2013.01); E05B 77/12 (2013.01); E05B 85/243 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19631869 A1 19980212; EP 0917612 A1 19990526; EP 0917612 B1 20000405; JP 2000515595 A 20001121; US 6062613 A 20000516; WO 9805840 A1 19980212

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160619

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160619

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160630

2017-03-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170228

2017-03-01 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160619

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160101

2016-01-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701413

2015-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150625

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150608

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150617

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140630

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-08-20 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59701413

- Representative's name: GOTTSCHALD PATENTANWALTSKANZLEI, DE

2005-02-08 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2005-02-01 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-06-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040620

2003-06-04 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030604

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701413 20000511

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990601

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990308

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE