Global Patent Index - EP 0917635 B1

EP 0917635 B1 2001-12-12 - A METHOD FOR MEASURING VENTILATION IN ROOMS WITH TRACER GAS TECHNIQUE

Title (en)

A METHOD FOR MEASURING VENTILATION IN ROOMS WITH TRACER GAS TECHNIQUE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR RAUMBELÜFTUNGSMESSUNG MIT SPÜRGASTECHNIK

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE MESURE DE VENTILATION DANS DES SALLES A L'AIDE D'UNE TECHNIQUE DE GAZ DE DEPISTAGE

Publication

EP 0917635 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97933981 A

Priority

  • SE 9701315 W
  • SE 9602884 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9804872A1] In a method for measuring the ventilation in zones in a zone-divided ventilated system, an amount of tracer gas proportional to the volume of the zone is spread in each zone. At the places where one is interested in determining the ventilation conditions, integrating samplers for the tracer gas are placed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24F 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24F 11/30 (2018.01); F24F 2110/00 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9804872 A1 19980205; WO 9804872 A8 19990805; AU 3715197 A 19980220; DE 69709120 D1 20020124; EP 0917635 A1 19990526; EP 0917635 B1 20011212; SE 510876 C2 19990705; SE 9602884 D0 19960729; SE 9602884 L 19980130

INPADOC legal status


2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130728

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130728

2012-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20120725

- Year of fee payment: 16

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-10-18 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2002-06-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-03-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020313

2002-03-12 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-03-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020312

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69709120 20020124

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-12-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-04-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010309

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990205

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK FI FR GB LI NL SE