Global Patent Index - EP 0917639 B1

EP 0917639 B1 2000-06-28 - STORAGE DEVICE

Title (en)

STORAGE DEVICE

Title (de)

LAGERVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE

Publication

EP 0917639 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97940049 A

Priority

  • DE 19631374 A
  • EP 9704156 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19631374A1] A storage device (20) providing principally horizontal storage space for items bottles of mineral water, beer, wine or similar items, fitted to an intermediary shelf (17) subdividing the storage capacity of an article of furniture (10) such as a refrigerator, food cupboard, shelf or similar, and providing a storage facility (19) underneath the surface (18) of the intermediary shelf (17). This storage facility (29) can be, to stock bottles (32), brought into a position (I) which is approximately parallel to the surface (18) of the storage shelf (17) by means of articulated joints. When unused the storage facility (29) can be placed directly underneath the shelf in a close, substantially parallel position (II) by means of the articulated joints.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25D 25/02; A47B 46/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 73/00 (2006.01); F25D 25/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 73/008 (2013.01); F25D 25/02 (2013.01); F25D 2325/022 (2013.01); F25D 2331/803 (2013.01); F25D 2331/809 (2013.01); F25D 2400/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19631374 A1 19980205; BR 9711011 A 20040720; CN 1138959 C 20040218; CN 1232536 A 19991020; EP 0917639 A1 19990526; EP 0917639 B1 20000628; ES 2150274 T3 20001116; TR 9900208 T2 19990721; WO 9805910 A1 19980212

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-30 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59701944

2017-05-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160730

2017-04-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160801

2017-04-28 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170331

2017-03-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160730

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160721

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160731

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150730

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-11-27 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20151022

2015-10-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150723

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150724

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-07-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-02 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERATE GMBH

- Effective date: 20150527

2015-05-13 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BSH BOSCH UND SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE GMBH, 81739 MUENCHEN, DE

- Document: DE 59701944

- Effective date: 20150402

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150274 T3

2000-09-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701944 20000803

2000-07-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000628

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990614

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990302

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT