Global Patent Index - EP 0917640 B1

EP 0917640 B1 2000-03-22 - ROTARY DRUM FOR DRYING POURABLE GOODS

Title (en)

ROTARY DRUM FOR DRYING POURABLE GOODS

Title (de)

DREHTROMMEL ZUM TROCKNEN VON RIESELFÄHIGEM GUT

Title (fr)

TAMBOUR ROTATIF POUR LE SECHAGE D'UN MATERIAU COULANT

Publication

EP 0917640 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97937538 A

Priority

  • DE 19631998 A
  • EP 9704185 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19631998C1] Directly heated rotary drums are used in the drying of pourable goods such as wood chips or strands. Drums are provided with built-in fixtures such as cross fixtures, in order to ensure good heat transmission from the drying gas to the goods. The invention comprises a design for a rotary drum (4) which enables good transmission of drying gas to the goods and which is cheap to produce and assemble in comparison with cross fixtures. According to the invention the built-in fixtures in the rotary drum (4) extend radially in the direction of the middle of the drum, starting from the perimeter, over an area of 60 to 85 % of the radius of the rotary drum (4), form at least two pockets, and run, apart from the area close to the perimeter, substantially in the direction of rotation (25), in front of the radial starting from their point of attachment. These radially shaped built-in fixtures enable constant distribution of the goods over the cross-section and are substantially cheaper to manufacture and assemble.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F26B 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F26B 11/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F26B 11/0409 (2013.01); F26B 11/0477 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR

EPO simple patent family

DE 19631998 C1 19971009; CA 2263178 A1 19980219; CA 2263178 C 20020723; EP 0917640 A1 19990526; EP 0917640 B1 20000322; ES 2145629 T3 20000701; US 6119363 A 20000919; WO 9806989 A1 19980219

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100202

2008-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080714

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040802

2005-04-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-03-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2004-08-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2003-07-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-04 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20030704

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030626

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145629 T3

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701330 20000427

2000-03-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR

1999-09-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990804

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990308

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR