Global Patent Index - EP 0917655 A4

EP 0917655 A4 2001-04-04 - ENHANCED TIME OF ARRIVAL METHOD

Title (en)

ENHANCED TIME OF ARRIVAL METHOD

Title (de)

ANKUNFTSZEIT-VERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TYPE INSTANT D'ARRIVEE AMELIORE

Publication

EP 0917655 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 96941929 A

Priority

US 9612836 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9807045A1] A method for improving a radio location system based on time-of-arrival. Time-of-arrival radio location systems are limited in ultimate accuracy by signal-to-noise ratio and by the time varying multipath environment in which they must operate. The present invention teaches techniques which maintain a high signal-to-noise ratio while identifying a feature of the received signal which is least affected by multipath. The technique uses correlation peak/envelope information to estimate the leading edge of the correlation function (402), then enhances discrete samples at the leading edge of the correlation function to yield high signal-to-noise ratio readings (405-408). The present invention can reduce required transmitted bandwidth, increase system resolution and accuracy by twenty to one, and maintain high message traffic throughput.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G01S 1/16; G01S 1/18; G01S 13/08; H04B 15/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01S 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G01S 1/045 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • No further relevant documents disclosed
  • See also references of WO 9807045A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9807045 A1 19980219; AU 1114497 A 19980306; EP 0917655 A1 19990526; EP 0917655 A4 20010404

INPADOC legal status


2003-02-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020814

2002-05-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020403

2002-03-27 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AXONN, L.L.C.

2001-04-04 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010220

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990219

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE