Global patent index - EP 0917674 B1

EP 0917674 B1 2000-05-03 - PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING THE DISPLACEMENT OF THE WINDOW PANE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR CONTROLLING THE DISPLACEMENT OF THE WINDOW PANE OF A MOTOR VEHICLE DOOR

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG DER BEWEGUNG EINER FENSTERSCHEIBE EINER KRAFTFAHRZEUGTÜR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE COMMANDER LE DEPLACEMENT DE LA VITRE D'UNE PORTIERE DE VEHICULE A MOTEUR

Publication

EP 0917674 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97937432 A

Priority

  • DE 9701668 W
  • DE 19632139 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19632139C1] A process is disclosed for controlling the displacement of the window pane of a motor vehicle door. As soon as the window pane is lowered, the window lifter drive is driven to lift the pane until the system slack of the displacing mechanism caused by the displacement of the window pane in the previous direction is compensated for. When the top edge of a free-standing, frameless window pane is lowered over a short distance out of a form-fitting sealing border on the car body, the opening of the car door generates, a signal which is transmitted to an electronic evaluation unit, and the drive of the window lifter is activated to lower the window pane until the window pane has moved from its closed position to a predetermined, partially open position. When the vehicle door is closed, a further signal is generated to automatically close again the automatically lowered window pane. While the drive is driven to automatically lower the window pane, a first phase of its adjusting movement is provided to compensate for the system slack of the window lifter mechanism and a second phase of its adjusting movement is provided to lower the window pane over a certain distance.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G05B 19/404

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/16 (2006.01); E05F 15/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05F 15/70 (2013.01); E05F 15/695 (2013.01); E05Y 2201/604 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/32 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/358 (2013.01); E05Y 2400/51 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/40 (2013.01); E05Y 2800/406 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/508 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/55 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19632139 C1 19970731; EP 0917674 A1 19990526; EP 0917674 B1 20000503; ES 2147018 T3 20000816; JP 2000516309 A 20001205; JP 4012573 B2 20071121; US 6166508 A 20001226; WO 9807079 A1 19980219

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59701599

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140731

- Year of fee payment: 18

2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-10-22 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20131022

2013-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120731

2013-04-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20130329

2011-11-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110817

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110727

- Year of fee payment: 15

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050727

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20060730

2006-07-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060730

2006-03-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2005-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050731

2005-07-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050730

2005-07-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050727

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-07-06 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040706

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2147018

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000713

2000-08-03 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: ABM AGENZIA BREVETTI & MARCHI

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59701599

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1999-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990920

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19990305

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE