Global Patent Index - EP 0917722 B1

EP 0917722 B1 2000-05-10 - FUSE-LINK WITH PIVOTING INDICATOR

Title (en)

FUSE-LINK WITH PIVOTING INDICATOR

Title (de)

SICHERUNGSEINSATZ MIT KLAPPKENNMELDER

Title (fr)

LIAISON FUSIBLE A INDICATEUR DE FUSION PIVOTANT

Publication

EP 0917722 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97942838 A

Priority

  • EP 97942838 A
  • EP 9704170 W
  • EP 96112822 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9807170A2] The invention concerns a fuse-link, in particular for low-voltage high-breaking-capacity (l.v.h.b.c.) fuses, whose working fuse element (1) is monitored by an indicator fuse element (2) which is disposed electrically parallel thereto, a spring element holding a signalling element (3) in an indicator device (4) against the traction exerted by the indicator fuse element (2). According to the invention, the signalling element (3) is held in the indicator device (4) on a stirrup-shaped spring element (5) which is in turn held pivotably in the indicator device (4) and, at a spacing from the imaginary pivot axis, forms a mounting (6) for the indicator fuse element (2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 85/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/00 (2006.01); H01H 85/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 85/303 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR LI NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9807170 A2 19980219; WO 9807170 A3 19980326; AT 192881 T 20000515; CN 1163935 C 20040825; CN 1226336 A 19990818; CZ 287822 B6 20010214; CZ 9900407 A3 19990512; DE 59701661 D1 20000615; EP 0917722 A2 19990526; EP 0917722 B1 20000510; ES 2147458 T3 20000901; HU 0001819 A2 20000928; HU 0001819 A3 20020328; HU 222940 B1 20031229; PL 187108 B1 20040531; PL 329080 A1 19990315; SI 917722 T1 20001031

INPADOC legal status


2011-05-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100802

2011-05-19 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59701661

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110201

2011-04-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20110331

2010-01-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090918

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090717

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-10-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040802

2005-08-31 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Effective date: 20050602

2005-04-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-02-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050201

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

2004-08-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040802

2004-07-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040731

2004-03-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-07-17 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030717

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-07-08 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030708

- Year of fee payment: 7

2003-06-26 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030626

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-10-11 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20021011

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2147458 T3

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701661 20000615

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI NL

2000-05-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990205

2000-05-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 192881 T 20000515

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990719

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990205

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR LI NL

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19990205