Global Patent Index - EP 0917744 B1

EP 0917744 B1 2002-11-27 - CONTACT CARRIER

Title (en)

CONTACT CARRIER

Title (de)

KONTAKTTRÄGER

Title (fr)

PORTE-CONTACT

Publication

EP 0917744 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98916962 A

Priority

  • DE 29704689 U
  • EP 9801515 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9842046A1] The invention concerns a contact carrier for an electric multiple plug-and-socket connector, said contact carrier comprising two contact carrier halves (1, 2) of electrically insulating material. Formed in each of the two contact carrier halves (1, 2) are cavities (3, 4) which are continuous in the axial direction. The cavities are used to receive electrically conductive contact parts, such as for example contact pins, and are aligned in the assembled state. In order to ensure an operationally reliable assembly, at least two radially resiliently flexible guide and holder projections (6, 7) extend in the axial direction from the edge of one of the contact carrier halves over the outer surface of the other contact carrier half (2). Formed in the guide and holder projections (6, 7) are recesses (10, 11, 15) which co-operate with radial projections (12, 13) provided on the outer surface of the other contact carrier half (2), such that the two contact carrier halves (1, 2) can be displaced relative to each other in the axial direction by a predetermined distance between two detent positions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/506; H01R 13/424; H01R 13/645

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/436 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB LI SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29704689 U1 19970515; EP 0917744 A1 19990526; EP 0917744 B1 20021127; WO 9842046 A1 19980924

INPADOC legal status


2018-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20171003

2017-10-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59806435

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100317

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100316

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100316

2010-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090319

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090119

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090121

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090319

- Year of fee payment: 12

2003-11-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030828

2003-07-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-01-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59806435 20030109

2002-12-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021127

2002-11-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE

2002-11-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010305

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19981026

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB LI SE