Global Patent Index - EP 0917746 B1

EP 0917746 B1 2000-12-13 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE TWISTING OF AT LEAST TWO SINGLE-LINES

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR THE TWISTING OF AT LEAST TWO SINGLE-LINES

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VERDRILLVORRICHTUNG ZUM VERDRILLEN VON MINDESTENS ZWEI EINZELLEITUNGEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TORSADAGE D'AU MOINS DEUX FILS ET DISPOSITIF CORRESPONDANT

Publication

EP 0917746 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97935571 A

Priority

  • DE 19631770 A
  • EP 9704265 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19631770A1] The invention relates to a method for the twisting of at least two single-lines and comprises the following steps: i) clamping of one of the ends (33) of individual lines (15,16) deviated along a certain length, in a separate untwisting device (10) rotating parallel to a twisting axis (A), ii) clamping of the other ends (33) of the individual lines in a separate twisting device (8), arranged so that they can rotate together on the twisting axis (A), iii) provision of a drill shuttle (6) in between the essentially taut lines (15,16) and iv) rotation of the twisting devices (8) on the twisting axis (A) and rotation, in the same direction, of the untwisting devices (10) about the axis of the individual lines (15,16). This method enables the production of twisted individual lines to be realized under more flexible production conditions. The invention also relates to a device for the twisting of at least two individual lines.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 43/28; H01B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01B 13/0207 (2013.01); H01B 13/0271 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

DE 1838249 U 19610928 - ROPPELT JOSEF [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 19631770 A1 19980212; DE 19631770 C2 19980827; EP 0917746 A1 19990526; EP 0917746 B1 20001213; ES 2154468 T3 20010401; US 6167919 B1 20010102; WO 9806155 A1 19980212

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070805

2009-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070805

2008-11-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070806

2008-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-07-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080301

2008-07-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070831

2008-04-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070805

2008-04-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-10-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20061020

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-09-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060929

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060831

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-15 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060815

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-08-11 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060811

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060731

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154468 T3

2001-03-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARCHI & PARTNERS S.R.L.

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59702766 20010118

2001-01-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWALTSBUERO JEAN HUNZIKER

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990720

1999-05-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990204

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE ES FR GB IT LI