Global Patent Index - EP 0917828 A3

EP 0917828 A3 2000-01-12 - Method and device for regulating the output humidity of tobacco

Title (en)

Method and device for regulating the output humidity of tobacco

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Regelung der Ausgangsfeuchte von Tabak

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif de régulation de l'humidité de sortie du tabac

Publication

EP 0917828 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121560 A

Priority

DE 19751525 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917828A2] The method involves spraying water from a first nozzle (30) into the input region of a loosening/conditioning drum (28) regulated according to the demand value for the tobacco output moisture, and the actual values for the tobacco mass flow, through flow of vapor and tobacco input moisture. Water is sprayed into the output region from a second nozzle (34) with demand value computed according to the demanded and actual values for the output moisture An Independent claim is also included for an arrangement for regulating the moisture output of tobacco

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A24B 3/04; A24B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A24B 3/04 (2006.01); A24B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A24B 3/04 (2013.01); A24B 3/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0917828 A2 19990526; EP 0917828 A3 20000112; EP 0917828 B1 20020619; DE 19751525 A1 19990602; DE 19751525 C2 20030213; US 2001000095 A1 20010405; US 6155269 A 20001205; US 6502581 B2 20030107

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20161118

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-06-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030320

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020619

2002-06-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

2002-06-19 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011123

2000-10-26 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: FR GB IT NL

2000-07-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000518

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): FR GB IT NL

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI