Global Patent Index - EP 0917836 A3

EP 0917836 A3 2002-09-25 - Apparatus for bevelling the edges of heel strengthening inserts for shoes

Title (en)

Apparatus for bevelling the edges of heel strengthening inserts for shoes

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Randabschrägung von Fersenkappen für Schuhe

Title (fr)

Dispositif de chanfreinage en biseau des bords de contreforts de talon pour chaussures

Publication

EP 0917836 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98120350 A

Priority

IT BO970644 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917836A2] The apparatus includes means (3) for picking up the heel strengthening inserts (1) to be bevelled from a magazine (2) and subsequently transferring them to a working surface (L). Conveying means (7) operate in the region of this working surface (L) to move forward these heel strengthening inserts (1). A first bevelling station (10) is provided with a first and a second pair of grinding belts (13,14;15,16), arranged in sequence on planes transversal to the heel strengthening inserts (1) advancement direction and aimed at bevelling the sides (1a) of the heel strengthening inserts (1) edge at a suitable angle. A second bevelling station (20) is provided with a third pair of grinding belts (23, 24), arranged in sequence on planes transversal to the heel strengthening inserts (1) moving direction and aimed at bevelling the upper parts (1b) of the heel strengthening inserts (1) edge at an angle suitably bigger than the bevelling angle of said sides (1a). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43D 8/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43D 8/32 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43D 8/32 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0917836 A2 19990526; EP 0917836 A3 20020925; IT 1295648 B1 19990524; IT BO970644 A1 19990430; IT BO970644 D0 19971029

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-14 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050503

2003-06-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES PT

2003-05-14 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20030317

2002-09-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI