Global Patent Index - EP 0917841 A3

EP 0917841 A3 2001-05-23 - Computer connectors

Title (en)

Computer connectors

Title (de)

Computersteckverbinder

Title (fr)

Connecteur d'ordinateur

Publication

EP 0917841 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98309439 A

Priority

GB 9724424 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917841A2] A desk insert or attachment which can be wired to power and data sources for a computer, and incorporating within it at least one power plug and at least one pin connector enabling a computer on the desk to receive power and data via the insert or attachment. One embodiment of attachment fits around the back portion of the desk. and has a back portion (22) which provides for the connection of power and data cables from sources thereof and an over-desktop portion (24) having an openable cover (25) beneath which pin connectors (28) and a withdrawable plug (26) are accessible. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 21/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 21/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0917841 A2 19990526; EP 0917841 A3 20010523; GB 2333649 A 19990728; GB 9724424 D0 19980114; GB 9825133 D0 19990113

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011124

2002-03-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-02-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI