Global patent index - EP 0917843 A3

EP 0917843 A3 2000-11-22 - Bed or chair with variable-position backrest

Title (en)

Bed or chair with variable-position backrest

Title (de)

Bett oder Stuhl mit verstellbarer Rückenlehne

Title (fr)

Lit ou chaise avec dossier réglale

Publication

EP 0917843 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98120689 A

Priority

IT MI972605 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917843A2] A bed or chair with variable-position backrest, comprising a seat portion (2) and a backrest (3) which is hinged to the seat portion (2), about a substantially horizontal axis (4), proximate to the rear side of the seat portion. The bed or chair comprises a detent device (5) which is interposed between the seat portion (2) and the backrest (3) and is suitable to lock the backrest, in its rotation about its horizontal axis (4), in positions which lie at various angles with respect to the plane of arrangement of the seat portion (2). An elastic means (6) is provided which is interposed between the seat portion (2) and the backrest (3) and elastically contrast the rotation of the backrest (3) about its horizontal axis (4) in the direction of rotation that causes an increase in the angle formed by the backrest (3) with respect to the plane of arrangement of the seat portion (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 1/026; A47C 20/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/026 (2006.01); A47C 20/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 1/026 (2013.01); A47C 20/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0917843 A2 19990526; EP 0917843 A3 20001122; IT 1296497 B1 19990625; IT MI972605 A1 19990522

INPADOC legal status

2003-07-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030121

2002-08-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020708

2001-08-08 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010502

2000-11-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI