Global Patent Index - EP 0917844 A3

EP 0917844 A3 2001-01-10 - Bench

Title (en)

Bench

Title (de)

Sitzbank

Title (fr)

Banc

Publication

EP 0917844 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121797 A

Priority

  • DE 29806666 U
  • DE 29720773 U
  • DE 29803167 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917844A2] The bench seat (1) has a backrest fitting (2) with two ground supports (7) which are to the rear of the legs (4) for the seat (1), at an angle to the rear or parallel to the legs. Their support points, on the ground, are to the rear of the bench (1). The backrest fitting (2) is attached to the seat (3) or the legs (4) of the seat.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 11/00; A47C 7/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 7/42 (2006.01); A47C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 11/00 (2013.01); A47C 7/42 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0917844 A2 19990526; EP 0917844 A3 20010110; DE 29720773 U1 19980129; DE 29803167 U1 19980528; DE 29806666 U1 19980917

INPADOC legal status


2002-05-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-10-31 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 47C 11/00 A, 7A 47C 7/42 B

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI