Global patent index - EP 0917912 A3

EP 0917912 A3 2000-07-19 - High-pressure cleaner

Title (en)

High-pressure cleaner

Title (de)

Hochdruckreiniger

Title (fr)

Nettoyeur à haute pression

Publication

EP 0917912 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120057 A

Priority

DE 29720383 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917912A2] The cleaner comprises a module (6) which is separate from the cleaner housing (2). The module is secured at the upper side to the mounting side of the housing and may be screwed into place. The under side of the module is structured as a mounting side like the under side of the housing. The module may have a hose drum (7) for winding the high pressure hose.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B08B 3/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B08B 3/026 (2013.01); B08B 2203/0276 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29720383 U1 19980212; EP 0917912 A2 19990526; EP 0917912 A3 20000719

INPADOC legal status

2001-12-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010120

2001-05-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2001-03-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-07-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI