Global Patent Index - EP 0917919 A3

EP 0917919 A3 2001-04-11 - Method for producing a one-piece evaporator for refrigeration circuits, and the evaporator obtained

Title (en)

Method for producing a one-piece evaporator for refrigeration circuits, and the evaporator obtained

Title (de)

Herstellungsverfahren eines einteiligen Verdampfers, und der hergestellte Verdampfer

Title (fr)

Procédé de fabrication d'un évaporateur monobloc, et évaporateur obtenu

Publication

EP 0917919 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98119923 A

Priority

IT MI972486 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917919A2] The method comprises dividing one and the same hairpin coil (2), fixed between two conductive sheets (3, 4), into two sections (G, F) of different refrigeration power by providing a separation cut (10) between the sheets (3, 4) in a position in which the hairpin coil (2) comprises greater-length rectilinear portions (2'A). That part of said longer portions which projects from the sheets (3, 4) is bent to flank one side of said sheets. The evaporator comprises two sections (G, F) of different refrigeration capacity, formed from one and the same hairpin coil (2) which at the point in which said sections join together comprises a loop bent towards one side of said sheets (3, 4). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 53/02; F25B 39/02; F28F 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 53/02 (2006.01); F25B 39/02 (2006.01); F28F 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/22 (2013.01); B21D 53/02 (2013.01); F25B 39/022 (2013.01); F25B 2339/022 (2013.01); F28F 2275/025 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0917919 A2 19990526; EP 0917919 A3 20010411; EP 0917919 B1 20040114; AR 017563 A1 20010912; BR 9804568 A 20010320; DE 69821081 D1 20040219; DE 69821081 T2 20041111; ES 2212819 T3 20040801; IT 1296073 B1 19990609; IT MI972486 A1 19990507

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161024

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161018

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161019

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160915

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160919

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-09-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2005-01-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041015

2004-10-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2212819 T3

2004-02-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69821081 P 20040219

2004-01-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2004-01-14 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT

2001-12-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20011009

2001-04-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI