Global Patent Index - EP 0917947 A3

EP 0917947 A3 2000-03-22 - Method and apparatus for making hinged lid boxes for cigarettes

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for making hinged lid boxes for cigarettes

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Klappschachteln für Zigaretten

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour la fabrication de boîtes à couvercle rabattant pour des cigarettes

Publication

EP 0917947 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98120800 A

Priority

DE 19751484 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917947A2] Hot-melt adhesive is used to join together the flaps (16, 17, 21, 22) in the compartment and cover sections (12, 13) of the blank (10) that form the compartment and cover side walls. The adhesive is applied to the corresponding regions of the unfolded blank and left to solidify and then later reactivated by heating as the flaps are being joined together. An Independent claim is also included for the cigarette packet making machine used to carry out this process.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 1/62; B31B 3/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65B 19/28 (2006.01); B31B 1/62 (2006.01); B31B 3/00 (2006.01); B65D 85/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 85/1045 (2013.01); B31B 50/622 (2017.08)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0917947 A2 19990526; EP 0917947 A3 20000322; EP 0917947 B1 20040908; BR 9805025 A 19991116; CN 1118365 C 20030820; CN 1220941 A 19990630; DE 19751484 A1 19990527; JP H11222205 A 19990817

INPADOC legal status


2015-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150602

2015-06-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59811920

2014-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081103

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081103

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081103

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071031

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071123

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050609

2004-11-10 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: FOCKE & CO. (GMBH & CO. KG)

2004-11-03 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20041013

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59811920 P 20041014

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030404

2001-02-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-02-07 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-01-31 [R17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20000801

2001-01-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH LI

2001-01-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001028

2001-01-24 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2001-01-04 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-12-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH LI

2000-11-29 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-03-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-03-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 31B 1/62 A, 7B 31B 3/00 B

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH LI

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI