Global Patent Index - EP 0917949 A3

EP 0917949 A3 2000-12-27 - Machine for producing corrugated board with at least one faced side

Title (en)

Machine for producing corrugated board with at least one faced side

Title (de)

Maschine zur Herstellung einer mindestens einseitig kaschierten Wellpappebahn

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication du carton ondulé avec au moins une face

Publication

EP 0917949 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98121095 A

Priority

DE 19751162 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917949A2] The machine has a continuous press blanket which presses the web against a ridged roller. The warps (30a-30c) of the blanket are pairs of three warps (30a-30c). The gap (b) between neighboring warp pairs is smaller than the width (a) of each warp pair. The ratio of the gap (b) between adjacent warp pairs (30a-30c) and the diameter (d) of the separate warps is 1.2d b 0.3d. The diameter (e) of the wefts (31) is larger than the diameter of the warps (30a-30c), using a rod wire for the wefts. The warps (30a-30c) are of twisted strands. The wefts (31) are of a softer material than the warps (30a-30c). The wefts (31) have surface notches to hold the warps (30a-30c) in place. The two outer warps (30a,30c) of each warp pair pass together over the wefts (31), and the center warp (30b) in each pair move in an opposite direction at the wefts. The warps in one pair have an opposing run round the wefts to the pattern of the neighboring warps, over the same weft (31).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31F 1/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31F 1/26 (2006.01); B31F 1/28 (2006.01); D03D 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 1/00 (2013.01); B31F 1/2877 (2013.01); D03D 9/00 (2013.01); D03D 13/004 (2013.01); D03D 13/008 (2013.01); D03D 15/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19751162 A1 19990520; EP 0917949 A2 19990526; EP 0917949 A3 20001227; EP 0917949 B1 20020605; JP H11216787 A 19990810; US 6092579 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160126

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151124

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20151123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-11-24 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-08-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59804301

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-01-30 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20011214

2001-09-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010417

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-09-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: BRADATSCH, EDMUND

1999-09-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: MENSING, HERMANN

1999-09-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GNAN, GUSTAF ALFONS

1999-09-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: GRAFF, WILHELM

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI