Global Patent Index - EP 0917959 A3

EP 0917959 A3 2000-04-12 - Recording medium cassette

Title (en)

Recording medium cassette

Title (de)

Kassette für Aufzeichnungsträger

Title (fr)

Cassette pour support d'enregistrement

Publication

EP 0917959 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 98121984 A

Priority

JP 31974097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0917959A2] A tape cassette 8 is removably mounted in a tape printing apparatus. In the tape printing apparatus, a carriage CA mounts a thermal head HD on which heating elements are arranged in a line corresponding to the width in a main scanning direction of a tape TP. The carriage CA can be moved in a sub-scanning direction perpendicular to the direction of arrangement of the heating elements within an open part 8e of the tape cassette 8. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 3/407

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 3/36 (2006.01); B41J 3/407 (2006.01); B41J 15/00 (2006.01); B41J 15/04 (2006.01); B41J 17/16 (2006.01); B41J 35/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 15/044 (2013.01); B41J 3/407 (2013.01); B41J 35/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0917959 A2 19990526; EP 0917959 A3 20000412; JP H11151844 A 19990608

INPADOC legal status


2001-07-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001013

2001-01-25 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-04-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 41J 3/407 A, 7B 41J 15/04 B

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-05-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI